London Youth Games Foundation

Charity number: 1048705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £1.11m £1.34m £672.04k £1.01m £989.52k
Total expenditure £951.15k £1.37m £800.97k £1.01m £787.04k
Income from government contracts £230.40k £232.00k £235.82k £224.32k £231.00k
Income from government grants £270.00k £270.00k N/A £450.00k £450.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.33k £11.58k £0 £7.89k £4.58k
Income - Other trading activities £703.69k £822.16k £300.68k £519.09k £512.69k
Income - Charitable activities £295.48k £459.97k £371.00k £486.00k £450.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £422 £159 £353 £472 £1.10k
Income - Other £112.94k £47.75k £0 £0 £21.15k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £931.70k £1.37m £800.97k £986.85k £768.27k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £19.46k £25.73k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £25.73k £0 £0 £148.50k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £19.22k £18.77k