London Youth Games Foundation

Charity number: 1048705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Roisin Wood Trustee 16 February 2021 None on record
Jane Elizabeth Garrard Trustee 23 April 2020 None on record
Stuart Burnside Trustee 24 October 2013 None on record
Neil Daugherty Trustee 05 December 2018 None on record
Charlotte Amy Serena Webster Trustee 23 January 2020 None on record
Paul Moreton Trustee 05 December 2018 None on record
Cllr Jessica Kate Leigh Trustee 23 April 2020 None on record
Mickela Hall-Ramsay Chair 27 January 2021 None on record
Krupa Sheth Trustee 23 April 2020
LONDON ROAD SAFETY COUNCIL Received: 5 days late
Peter Timothy Fortune Trustee 23 April 2020 None on record
Anna Rissen Trustee 05 December 2018 None on record
Timothy Huish GALLICO Trustee 05 December 2018 None on record