THE FRIENDS OF ST CLEMENT DANES CENTRAL CHURCH OF THE ROYAL AIR FORCE

Charity number: 1048757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 29 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 19 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 28 August 2019 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 14 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 08 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required