THE FRIENDS OF ST CLEMENT DANES CENTRAL CHURCH OF THE ROYAL AIR FORCE

Charity number: 1048757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £18.51k £23.63k £21.17k £19.33k £10.02k
Total expenditure £24.75k £13.00k £16.15k £16.26k £13.72k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A