Financial history ROSSENDALE ROUND TABLE NUMBER 628

Charity number: 1048787
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A