Accounts and annual returns ST.JOSEPH'S CATHOLIC INFANT SCHOOL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1048818
Charity reporting is overdue by 717 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 352 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 352 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 717 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 717 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 March 2022 271 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 April 2021 302 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 21 January 2020 205 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required