EAST SUFFOLK AND NORTH ESSEX NHS FOUNDATION TRUST CHARITABLE FUNDS

Charity number: 1048827
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 23 August 1995: Standard registration
  • 17 December 2015: Funds received from 1058756 IPSWICH ARTHRITIS FOUNDATION
  • 15 October 2018: Funds received from 1048827-1 GENERAL AND ELDERLY MEDICINE DIRECTORATE GENERAL C...
  • 17 October 2018: Funds received from 1048827-2 DEPARTMENT OF SURGERY GENERAL CHARITY
  • 23 November 2018: Funds received from 1051504 COLCHESTER HOSPITAL UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUS...
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • COLCHESTER AND IPSWICH HOSPITALS CHARITY (Working name)
  • IPSWICH HOSPITAL NHS TRUST CHARITABLE FUNDS (Previous name)
  • THE IPSWICH HOSPITAL CHARITY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property