Financial history THE DALES SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1048839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £6.99k £23.03k £11.22k £2.60k £3.78k
Total expenditure £4.28k £4.43k £3.23k £1.32k £2.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £2.61k N/A N/A N/A