Financial history G.W. STANIFORTH CHARITY

Charity number: 1048890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £81.52k £81.98k £85.78k £68.88k £90.29k
Total expenditure £65.79k £59.10k £182.79k £79.44k £114.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A