Trustees G.W. STANIFORTH CHARITY

Charity number: 1048890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

23 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stuart Wright Chair 06 May 2015
None on record
Tina Cunnell Trustee 18 February 2022
None on record
Sylvia Armes Trustee 28 July 2021
None on record
Nik Chapman CBE Trustee 28 July 2021
None on record
Barbara Tullett Trustee 11 May 2021
None on record
ken Parker Trustee 11 May 2021
None on record
Mark Taylor Trustee 07 May 2019
None on record
Carla Barreto Trustee 07 May 2019
None on record
David Hodgkinson Trustee 07 May 2019
THETFORD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Mac Macdonald Trustee 28 September 2017
FRIENDS OF THE RAF REGIMENT HERITAGE CENTRE
Received: On time
Emma Kelly Trustee 07 May 2017
None on record
Sharon Nash Trustee 06 May 2017
None on record
Terry Jermy Trustee 06 May 2015
None on record
Jane James Trustee 06 May 2015
None on record
Chris Harvey Trustee 06 May 2015
None on record
Brenda Canham Trustee 06 May 2015
THETFORD MUNICIPAL AND UNITED CHARITIES
Overdue by 35 days
CHARITY OF SIR JOSEPH WILLIAMSON FOR APPRENTICING
Overdue by 35 days
THETFORD MUNICIPAL AND UNITED ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Overdue by 35 days
THE CHARLES BURRELL MUSEUM
Received: On time
Denis Crawford Trustee 06 May 2015
THETFORD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Mike Brindle Trustee 06 May 2015
None on record
Bryan Skull Trustee 06 May 2015
None on record
Pat Pearson Trustee 06 May 2015
None on record
Roy Brame Trustee 06 May 2015
None on record
Jennifer Hollis Trustee 06 May 2015
None on record
Thetford Town Council Trustee 01 May 2015
THE LADY GENTLE MEMORIAL
Received: On time