Trustees WOODLANDS HOSPICE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1048934
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Barry James Bartlett Chair 27 May 2014
None on record
Ying Xi Trustee 17 May 2022
None on record
Christopher John Hudson Trustee 22 February 2022
BEECHLEY STABLES RDA
Received: On time
Sarah Wooliscroft Trustee 22 February 2022
None on record
Carl Walthew Trustee 22 February 2022
None on record
Robert Tsze Kwan Lee Trustee 28 May 2019
None on record
Annette Johnson Trustee 26 May 2015
ROTUNDA LTD
Received: On time
Dr CATHY HUBBERT Trustee
None on record
COLIN BRENNAND FCA Trustee
None on record