FRIENDS OF ESKDALE SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds to donate to St Bega's School, Eskdale to enhance the resources and opportunities available to the pupils
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £31,848 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cumbria
Governance
- 12 September 1995: Standard registration
- 29 April 2016: Funds received from 1023691 ESKDALE NURSERY
- ESKDALE SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mari Elisabeth Staniforth | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Botterill | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH STELLMACHER | Trustee | 10 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
MADONNA ADAMS | Trustee | 10 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.42k | £0 | £3.07k | £14.20k | £42.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.63k | £8.11k | £5.57k | £13.33k | £40.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £31.85k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 19 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 APRIL 1987 AS AMENDED 24 JANUARY 1995 AND 23 FEBRUARY 2004 AS AMENDED ON 12 OCTOBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Begas C of E Primary School
Eskdale
HOLMROOK
HOLMROOK
Cumbria
CA19 1TD
- Phone:
- 07588500415
- Email:
- paulandjen@rocketmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window