BARNSLEY AND DISTRICT DYSLEXIA ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1049130
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of Dyslexia education to children and young persons in the Barnsley area

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnsley

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 September 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • DYSLEXIA UNIT (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simon Peter Alliott Trustee 01 August 2012
BARNSLEY DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
THE COMMON ALLOTMENTS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE CUTLER (SILKSTONE) AND OTHER CHARITIES
Received: On time
TOWN SCHOOL FOUNDATION WITH CLARKSON'S ENDOWMENT
Received: On time
SOUTH YORKSHIRE COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
ALAN METHLEY Trustee 16 November 2011
JAMES EDWARD FRUDD
Received: On time
BARNSLEY AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Received: On time
BARNSLEY PREMIER LEISURE
Received: On time

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 30 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 05 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 14 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 14 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 30 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1.04 Digital Media Centre
County Way
BARNSLEY
S70 2JW
Phone:
07757997927
Website:

No information available