Financial history SHEFFIELD LIVING WATERS CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1049186
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £27.68k £26.70k £26.68k £27.85k £33.20k
Total expenditure £24.52k £23.06k £23.41k £24.75k £23.17k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £9.25k