Financial history ROYAL PAPWORTH HOSPITAL CHARITY

Charity number: 1049224
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.08m £1.83m £2.46m £3.01m £2.77m
Total expenditure £6.88m £1.99m £3.62m £2.42m £2.06m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.75m £1.54m £2.19m £2.78m £2.62m
Income - Other trading activities £41.00k £47.00k £27.00k £28.00k £15.00k
Income - Charitable activities £89.00k £57.00k £48.00k £44.00k £27.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £207.00k £188.00k £195.00k £164.00k £113.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £2.04m £760.00k £1.63m £2.07m £604.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.74m £1.89m £3.06m £2.08m £2.00m
Expenditure - Raising funds £139.00k £99.00k £553.00k £340.00k £59.00k
Expenditure - Governance £6.00k £6.00k £6.00k £4.00k £80.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £1.80m £3.00m £1.59m £1.92m
Expenditure - Investment management £59.00k £25.00k £43.00k £67.00k £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0