FRIENDS OF GARBOLDISHAM SCHOOL

Charity number: 1049354
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General Fundraising eg cake stalls, summer fair, demonstration evenings, Family events etc

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £3,030
Total expenditure: £2,438

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 1995: Standard registration
  • 09 April 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 07 January 2014: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • F R O G S (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Emma Newby Trustee 01 October 2024
ALLOTMENT FOR RECREATION GROUND
Received: On time
Alice Mary Elizabeth Ravenhill Trustee 24 January 2023
ALLOTMENT FOR RECREATION GROUND
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £5.09k £1.66k £2.83k £3.33k £3.03k
Total expenditure £4.92k £966 £3.63k £5.08k £2.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 23 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 02 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 28 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 11 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
C/O GARBOLDISHAM CHURCH SCHOOL
CHURCH ROAD
GARBOLDISHAM
DISS
NORFOLK
IP22 2SE
Phone:
01953681327
Website:

No information available