FORWARD IN FAITH MINISTRY U.K.

Charity number: 1049383
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.99m £4.12m £3.47m £3.79m £3.68m
Total expenditure £2.52m £2.47m £2.21m £2.32m £2.32m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.99m £4.12m £3.47m £3.78m £3.67m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £908 £224 £1.19k £6.57k £13.81k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.08m £2.16m £2.18m £2.30m £2.29m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £365.65k £288.62k £378.73k £362.77k £394.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £68.94k £25.00k £24.81k £23.42k £29.32k