BIRMINGHAM I A
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Birmingham IA provides help and support for people who face, or who have undergone, radical bowel surgery,an Ileostomy or Internal Pouch operation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People
11 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Solihull
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
Governance
- 25 September 1995: Standard registration
- BIRMINGHAM ILEOSTOMY ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Syeda Akhtar | Trustee | 08 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Anthony Woolston | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Dhokiya | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Vaughan Greenway | Trustee | 12 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kalpana Kaur Manotta | Trustee | 02 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kate Elizabeth Pine Miss | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bogusha Bury | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mark Barnes | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Maggie Butler | Trustee | 09 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL WILLIAM GRAHAM JAMESON | Trustee | 13 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET MARY COSTELLO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.63k | £9.33k | £17.71k | £4.72k | £15.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.23k | £1.89k | £3.25k | £7.91k | £13.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 04 March 2024 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 APR 1995 AS AMENDED ON 21 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (THE “OBJECTS”) ARE: TO HELP ANYONE LIVING IN THE BIRMINGHAM AREA AND ELSEWHERE WHOSE COLON HAS BEEN, OR IS ABOUT TO BE, REMOVED BY SURGICAL PROCEDURE OR WHO HAS AN ILEOSTOMY OR AN INTERNAL POUCH; TO PROMOTE AND CO-ORDINATE RESEARCH INTO BOWEL DISEASE AND OTHER CONDITIONS LEADING TO THE REMOVAL OF THE COLON, SURGICAL PROCEDURES PERTAINING THERETO, AND RELATED MATTERS AND FURTHER TO PROMOTE THE DISSEMINATION OF KNOWLEDGE GAINED BY SUCH RESEARCH; TO KEEP ILEOSTOMISTS AND OTHERS INFORMED OF ALL MATTERS OF INTEREST TO THE CHARITY BY THE PERIODIC DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION BY WAY OF PUBLICATIONS, BY ARRANGING CONFERENCES, SEMINARS AND COURSES ON TOPICS OF INTEREST, AND IN ANY OTHER MANNER WHICH IS CHARITABLE AND WHICH THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER APPROPRIATE.
Area of benefit
BIRMINGHAM AREA AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Manders Close
Astwood Bank
Redditch
Worcestershire
B96 6BJ
- Phone:
- 012135532745
- Email:
- mike.jameson@iasupport.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window