THE FRIENDS OF OXFORD HAEMOPHILIA CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 26 September 1995: Standard registration
- 03 November 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- FRIENDS OF OXFORD HAEMOPHILIA CENTRE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £4.76k | £610 | £194 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £334 | £415 | £497 | £587 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 04 November 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 23 December 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 17 September 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 29 November 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 12 September 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 MAY 1992 AND AMENDED 17 SEPTEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
FOR OR TOWARDS THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT FOR THE PATIENTS OF THE OXFORD HAEMOPHILIA CENTRE WHICH MAY BE REQUIRED FOR THE TREATMENT OF SUCH PATIENTS.
Area of benefit
OXFORD HAEMOPHILIA CENTRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window