RAZA ISLAMIC MISSION-LONDON RAZA ISLAMIC MISSION-LONDON

Charity number: 1049460
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 26 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required