1ST HASSOCKS SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting activities within the town of Hassocks, under the auspices of the Scouts Association
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- West Sussex
Governance
- 29 September 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Annie Hatton | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dougal Betts | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leianne Edwards | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Buss | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven James Wickens | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Horner | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicolas James Dias | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Plaskett | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Whitehead | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN SPENCER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.67k | £28.60k | £31.43k | £24.85k | £20.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.62k | £10.62k | £30.50k | £27.23k | £21.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 February 2023 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 March 2023 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 February 2022 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 February 2022 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4TH JANUARY 1912. AMENDED 19TH JULY 1991.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL,INTELLECTUAL SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS,AS INDIVIDUALS,AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL,NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
HASSOCKS
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Flowers Close
HASSOCKS
West Sussex
BN6 8FF
- Phone:
- 01273845649
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window