Financial history FRIENDS OF HEMPTON CHURCH

Charity number: 1049594
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022
Total gross income £6.10k £3.29k £3.27k £577 £2.00k
Total expenditure £12.58k £5.18k £2.88k £5.68k £1.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A