Accounts and annual returns GOLDINGTON GREEN PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1049595
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 20 May 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 09 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 13 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 24 November 2020 147 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required