Financial history GOLDINGTON GREEN PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1049595
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £9.59k £473 £632 £1.84k £5.33k
Total expenditure £9.86k £123 £3.84k £3.44k £6.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A