HAWES DOWN PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1049656
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £24.82k £32.11k £26.66k £13.20k £19.33k
Total expenditure £23.44k £39.08k £28.30k £22.44k £16.77k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A