Accounts and annual returns SIFA FIRESIDE

Charity number: 1049728
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 25 January 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 25 January 2024 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 23 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window