ANGOLAN CONSULTATIVE PROJECT

Charity number: 1049779
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 February 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 March 2020 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 23 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required