SOUTH WEST CHAMBER CHOIR

Charity number: 1049783
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £2.41k £4.05k £3.45k £5.56k £2.04k
Total expenditure £2.68k £4.21k £3.58k £4.78k £2.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A