Financial history QE2 (HORSHAM) TRUST

Charity number: 1049807
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £6.30k £8.21k £1.61k £6.63k £4.05k
Total expenditure £586 £216 £216 £216 £216
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A