Trustees YMCA DERBYSHIRE
Charity number: 1049904

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andreea Tudor | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Scott Knowles | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Henshaaw | Trustee | 04 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Margaret Summers | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher William Judson | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Julian Hollywell | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Joanna Cordon | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Julian Smith | Trustee | 26 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Karen Brierley | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jayne Bradley | Trustee | 13 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
HELEN MICHELE WIGGLESWORTH | Trustee | 23 September 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.