LEICESTER DISABLED INTEGRATED SPORTS CLUB

Charity number: 1049951
Charity reporting is overdue by 770 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 39 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 39 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 404 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 404 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 770 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 770 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 April 2021 887 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 05 April 2021 1252 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required