Financial history SAXHAM TRUST

Charity number: 1050131
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £9.36k £70.60k £5.87k £10.73k £9.64k
Total expenditure £38.92k £94.15k £35.16k £32.13k £33.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A