THE ROSALIND HICKS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1050135
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £20.41k £24.93k £47.75k £23.53k £29.19k
Total expenditure £35.73k £42.49k £34.66k £31.55k £14.63k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A