Financial history THE PRET FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1050195
Charity reporting is up to date (151 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.88m £2.16m £2.21m £2.80m £803.03k
Total expenditure £2.07m £1.81m £2.18m £1.30m £1.45m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.88m £2.16m £2.21m £2.80m £803.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £81 £199 £703 £599 £33
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.07m £1.81m £2.18m £1.30m £1.45m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £10.75k £10.75k £14.39k £47.29k £39.60k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £730.17k £190.72k £189.94k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0