BATH CITY FARM

Charity number: 1050202
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £190.30k £244.02k £294.93k £252.34k £315.26k
Total expenditure £182.90k £198.01k £260.40k £286.07k £285.84k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £10.00k £0 N/A N/A