BATH CITY FARM

Charity number: 1050202
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DEBORAH RUTH STEELE Trustee 21 March 2016 None on record
Christina Shireen Button Trustee 02 December 2019 None on record
Tamsin Egan Trustee 02 October 2019 None on record
Malcolm Dodds Trustee 14 November 2016 None on record
Mark Richardson Trustee 02 October 2019
BEAR FLAT ENVIRONMENT Recently registered
Joanne Southwell Chair 26 February 2019 None on record
Amy Coulthard Trustee 27 November 2019 None on record
MR Mike Collins Trustee 18 April 2015 None on record
Mr Gus Langley Trustee 23 April 2016 None on record