Financial history TOLLESBURY SILVER THREADS

Charity number: 1050233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.22k £2.62k £3.02k £3.55k £0
Total expenditure £2.88k £3.37k £3.70k £3.74k £279
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A