ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1050239
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £7.43k £5.87k £6.37k £7.64k £2.66k
Total expenditure £10.19k £4.65k £6.27k £8.49k £2.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A