HURST WATER MEADOW TRUST

Charity Number: 1050272
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To preserve, conserve and protect The Hurst Water Meadow and any other land acquired by the Trust, its terrestrial and acquatic life and their habitats for the benefit of the public. To advance public education in the study and research of Dorchester on Thames' water meadows and their conservation and the dissemination of the useful results of such research.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020

Total income: £20,980
Total expenditure: £5,339

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 October 1995: Standard registration
  • 09 September 2021: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
  • 09 September 2021: Funds transferred to 1191096 THE HURST WATER MEADOW TRUST
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £15.98k £13.72k £11.14k £18.07k £20.98k
Total expenditure £18.98k £12.09k £2.81k £5.52k £5.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.55k £6.04k £3.64k £8.47k £5.01k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required