Trustees THE LEPROSY MISSION ENGLAND, WALES, THE CHANNEL ISLANDS AND THE ISLE OF MAN

Charity number: 1050327
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR RALPH COLIN TURNER Chair
CHROMA CHURCH
Received: On time
VALLEY LIFE TRUST
Received: On time
Ram Gidoomal Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
Zoica Bakirtzief de SIlva Pereira Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
Edward Robert Burrows Walker Trustee 05 October 2020
None on record
Marieke Jellema Trustee 29 June 2019
None on record
Paul Halliday Trustee 13 September 2018
None on record
TIMOTHY BROOKS Trustee 15 September 2016
None on record
Andrew Lancaster Trustee 15 September 2016
None on record
Diana White Trustee 15 September 2016
None on record
MR PETER WATSON Trustee 12 August 2013
None on record
PAUL CRAIG Trustee 12 August 2013
None on record
ANNE CHRISTINE FENDICK Trustee
None on record
HENRY MICHAEL ANSTEY Trustee
None on record