Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ST. MARY'S CHURCH, ORLESTONE

Charity number: 1050355
Charity reporting is overdue by 2 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 2 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 2 days
Annual return 30 April 2022 20 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 25 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 21 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required