FRIENDS OF ST. MARY'S CHURCH, ORLESTONE

Charity number: 1050355
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Fletcher Trustee 19 September 2016 None on record
ANN PREBBLE Trustee 27 July 2012 None on record
Valentine Dorothy Showell Trustee 18 June 2018 None on record
LUCHIA McGRORY Trustee 18 September 2017 None on record
PRISCILLA FRANCES LAWRENCE Trustee 18 September 2017 None on record
BRIAN EDWARD LAWRENCE Trustee None on record
Joyce Margaret Smith Trustee 20 June 2016 None on record
Janette Margaret Ransley Trustee 21 March 2016 None on record
MRS A BROMFIELD Chair 11 April 2012 None on record
Janet Allen Trustee 13 June 2017 None on record
CAROLA MARGARET CLAYDEN GOSTLING Trustee 27 July 2012 None on record
Basil Smith Trustee 17 June 2019 None on record
Carol Archer Trustee 17 June 2019 None on record
Gillian Bromfield Trustee 26 June 2016 None on record