Accounts and annual returns AL-ASR SCHOLASTIC RESEARCH ESTABLISHMENT LONDON UK

Charity number: 1050383
Charity reporting is up to date (39 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 December 2022 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 09 December 2022 39 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 03 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 09 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window