Totternhoe CE Academy Parents' Association

Charity number: 1050415
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 02 July 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 23 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 03 July 2018 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 19 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required