Accounts and annual returns DRUGS-N-SPORTS DON'T MIX INITIATIVE

Charity number: 1050457
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 March 2020 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required