Financial history THE WHITE CLIFFS COUNTRY U3A

Charity number: 1050607
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £14.57k £16.71k £20.87k £16.61k £6.16k
Total expenditure £12.22k £20.88k £18.62k £14.61k £5.21k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A