THE MANCHESTER CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 1050663
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £13.71k £8.42k £6.16k £9.45k £2.12k
Total expenditure £12.07k £10.13k £6.55k £8.38k £1.60k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A