THE TANYARD TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Donations to local and national responsible bodies according to the trust deed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 14 November 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lorcan Portway | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Mary Portway | Trustee | 28 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
NICOLAS WEBB PORTWAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES GEORGE WEBB PORTWAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.94k | £0 | £2.02k | £2.73k | £2.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £2.00k | £2.00k | £2.54k | £3.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7 AUGUST 1995
Charitable objects
(1) FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION (2) FOR THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF MEDICAL RESEARCH AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF RESEARCH (3) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO FURTHER THE PRESERVATION PROTECTION DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF BUILDINGS AND OTHER FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST (4) FOR THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS
Area of benefit
STOWMARKET SUFFOLK AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Tanyard Trust
COMBS TANNERY
TANNERY ROAD
COMBS
STOWMARKET
IP14 2EN
- Phone:
- 01449612022
- Email:
- info@tanyardtrust.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window