Trustees THE ASSOCIATION OF ACCOUNTING TECHNICIANS
Charity number: 1050724

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINA ANNE EARLS MAAT | Chair | 18 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
LUCY COHEN FMAAT | Trustee | 16 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL HARRIS MBA MAAT | Trustee | 16 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER ARGENT | Trustee | 16 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
FRANCESCA NATALIA TRICARICO MAAT | Trustee | 16 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH WALKLETT FMAAT | Trustee | 16 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
REBEKAH GLOVER FCCA FMAAT | Trustee | 16 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Heather Durrell MAAT | Trustee | 17 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Michael David Steed | Trustee | 17 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Anne Marie Moore ACMA | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rita Patel FMAAT | Trustee | 18 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ernest Badasu MAAT | Trustee | 18 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Murray MAAT | Trustee | 18 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Leonard Donno | Trustee | 20 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARK JONATHAN POWELL | Trustee | 21 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JANE FRANCES CUTHBERTSON MAAT | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER ALICE HILL FMAAT | Trustee | 20 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
kevin Bragg | Trustee | 15 May 2015 |
|
|||||
DAVID JOHN QUIGG BA CA MAAT | Trustee | 15 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
David Frederick | Trustee | 16 May 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.