SYDERSTONE HAPPY FACES PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1050784
Charity reporting is overdue by 151 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 151 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 151 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 October 2020 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 22 October 2020 114 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 13 December 2019 166 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 13 December 2019 166 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 12 August 2018 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 August 2018 43 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 12 August 2018 408 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 August 2018 408 days late Download